City of Columbus et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Morgan, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, City of Chicago, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore and Stephen Vondra
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Seema Verma, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2018cv02364
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie Morgan, City of Cincinnati, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, Stephen Vondra. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie Morgan, City of Cincinnati, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, Stephen Vondra. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Grogg, Adam)
August 16, 2018 Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Shea. Directing attorney Jennifer Shea to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Campisano. Directing attorney Charles Campisano to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lara Baker-Morrish. Directing attorney Lara Baker-Morrish to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Zach Klein. Directing attorney Zach Klein to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 28 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Shea by City of Columbus. The fee has already been paid.(Kropf, Sara)
August 14, 2018 Filing 27 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Campisano by City of Columbus. The fee has already been paid.(Kropf, Sara)
August 14, 2018 Filing 26 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lara Baker-Morrish by City of Columbus. The fee has already been paid.(Kropf, Sara)
August 14, 2018 Filing 25 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zach Klein by City of Columbus. The fee has already been paid.(Kropf, Sara)
August 9, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Sangree on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Sangree, Suzanne)
August 6, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre M Davis on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Davis, Andre)
August 6, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ryan Martinez on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2018 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Columbus needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Columbus needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Columbus needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra, City of Cincinnati, City of Chicago, City of Columbus needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Javier M Guzman. Directing attorney Javier M Guzman to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John T Lewis. Directing attorney John T Lewis to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Adam Grogg. Directing attorney Adam Grogg to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lara Baker-Morrish (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7481504.) by City of Columbus(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zach Klein (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7481500.) by City of Columbus(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Campisano (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7481499.) by City of Columbus(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Shea (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7481477.) by City of Chicago, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by City of Chicago (Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by City of Cincinnati (Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by City of Columbus (Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Javier M. Guzman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7479545.) by City of Chicago, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John T. Lewis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7479544.) by City of Chicago, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Grogg (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7479542.) by City of Chicago, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by City of Chicago, City of Cincinnati, City of Columbus, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, Bonnie Morgan, Stephen Vondra re #1 Complaint, (requesting issuance of additional summonses) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kropf, Sara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7479532.), filed by Bonnie Morgan, City of Cincinnati, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, Stephen Vondra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kropf, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Columbus et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Morgan
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cincinnati
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Columbus
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Represented By: Lara Baker Morrish
Represented By: Zach Klein
Represented By: Jennifer Shea
Represented By: Charles Campisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chicago
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan Martinez
Represented By: Andre M Davis
Represented By: Suzanne Sangree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Vondra
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Javier M Guzman
Represented By: Sara Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?