Meade Communities, LLC v. Lebo

Plaintiff: Meade Communities, LLC
Defendant: Aaron Lebo and Aaron J. Lebo
Case Number: 1:2018cv02462
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Meade Communities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Eviction, #4 Text of Proposed Order Writ of Execution, #5 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Adam)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron J. Lebo (c/m 10/2/2018 tds, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Meade Communities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Adam)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meade Communities, LLC. Aaron J. Lebo served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018.(Smith, Adam)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aaron J. Lebo.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Meade Communities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Meade Communities, Other Affiliate Corvias Military Living, LLC, Other Affiliate Corvias Management Army, LLC for Meade Communities, LLC.(Smith, Adam)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron Lebo ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7497548.), filed by Meade Communities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons - Lebo)(Smith, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meade Communities, LLC v. Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade Communities, LLC
Represented By: Adam Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron J. Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?