Short v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Mrs. Veronica Short and Veronica Gales Short
Defendant: Act. Dir. NANCY A. BERRYHILL and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv02714
Filed: September 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Gales Short. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2018 Filing 2 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/5/2018 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
September 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7537787.), filed by Veronica Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment Corporate Interest Discl, #8 Summons Berryhill, #9 Summons USAG, #10 Summons USAO - Baltimore)(Hanover, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Veronica Short
Represented By: Sean Regan Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gales Short
Represented By: Sean Regan Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act. Dir. NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?