Oliver v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Christopher Oliver
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02716
Filed: September 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Final Judgment by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/19/2018. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver Notice of Withdraw of Appearance (Sawyer, Sarah)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Lynch on behalf of Brandon Christopher Oliver (Lynch, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION in Lieu of Answer by Brandon Christopher Oliver(Sawyer, Sarah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018.(Sawyer, Sarah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Sawyer, Sarah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Christopher Oliver was filed without a civil cover sheet. **Please file the civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing fee:$ 400, receipt number 14637108730 (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, filed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sawyer, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Christopher Oliver
Represented By: Sarah Sawyer
Represented By: Timothy C Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?