Stakeholder et al v. Toye et al
Plaintiff: Fenwick Stakeholder, Regina Fenwick and Edward Fenwick
Defendant: Alex M. Azar and Jessica Toye
Case Number: 1:2018cv02739
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #6 Defendant Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health & Human Services' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (until through and including November 12, 2018). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/17/2018. (rass, Chambers)
October 10, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule FILING OF REMAINING STATE COURT PAPERS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 103.5(Marquardt, Sarah)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alex M. Azar.(Marquardt, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/12/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9.12.18)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Removal Notification Letter sent to Regina & Edward Fenwick. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Alex M. Azar (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marquardt, Sarah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5(Marquardt, Sarah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Saint Mary's County, case number D-043-CV-18-01168., filed by Alex M. Azar. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 COMPLAINT, #4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #5 MISC. CIVIL FILING ERROR NOTICE, #6 INTRACOURT CASE TRANSMITTAL- CV, #7 NOTICE OF DOCKETING APPEAL JESSICA TOYE, #8 WRIT OF SUMMONS ALEX M AZAR II, #9 WRIT OF SUMMONS EDWARD FENWICK)(Marquardt, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stakeholder et al v. Toye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fenwick Stakeholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Toye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?