Mohammadi v. Air France - KLM
Plaintiff: Shirley Mohammadi
Defendant: Air France and Air-France - KLM
Case Number: 1:2018cv02744
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving #14 STIPULATION ACCEPTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Air-France - KLM. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/10/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION ACCEPTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Air-France - KLM(Kende, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Shirley Mohammadi (Uehlinger, Gerard)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kende, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/4/2018. (daws, Chambers)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/4/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/4/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2018 Telephone Conference with all counsel re: status held on 10/3/2018 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Kende. Directing attorney Christopher Kende to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher B. Kende (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7560974.) by Air-France - KLM(Scheib, Megan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Air-France - KLM re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Scheib, Megan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Air-France - KLM identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM for Air-France - KLM.(Scheib, Megan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Removal Notification Letter mailed (c/m counsel 9/6/2018-sls) (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/7/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/6/2018. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Air France identifying Corporate Parent Air France, Corporate Parent Air France-KLM for Air France.(Scheib, Megan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baltimore County, case number 03-c-18-8070. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7543292), filed by Air France. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scheib, Megan) Modified on 9/7/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammadi v. Air France - KLM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Mohammadi
Represented By: Gerard P Uehlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air France
Represented By: Megan Susan Scheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air-France - KLM
Represented By: Megan Susan Scheib
Represented By: Christopher Burgess Kende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?