Stephens v. Carpenter et al.

Petitioner: Lee E. Stephens, Jr.
Respondent: Brian Frosh, Terry Royal, Warden Dayena M. Corcoran, Stephen T Moyer and Mike Carpenter
Case Number: 1:2018cv02826
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (18-493). (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 1:18-cv-00493-RDB. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER Consolidating Civil Action RDB 18-2826 with Civil Action RDB 18-493; Clerk shall docket all pleadings filed in Civil Action RDB 18-2826 in Civil Action RDB 18-493; Order directing Clerk to close Civil Action RDB 18-2826. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/11/2018. (c/m 10/11/18)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER giving counsel 21 days within this Order to notify the court why case number 18-493-RDB and case number 18-2826-RDB should not be consolidated. Clerk shall send a copy of this order to counsel in case number 18-493-RDB and case number 18-2826-RDB. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/12/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(C/M-09-14-2018)
September 12, 2018 16 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 5, 2018 15 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying #10 petitioner's Motion to Stay and transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland for all further proceedings. See 28 U.S.C. 1631. (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West :Substituting Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden, as the respondent in this case. Petitioner is incarcerated at Oklahoma State Penitentiary in McAlester, Oklahoma, and Mike Carpenter is the Interim Warden of that facility. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Lee E. Stephens, Jr., Petitioner, v. Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden, Respondent.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 13 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-18-53-JHP-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2018 12 Further NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
March 1, 2018 11 NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachments)(Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition And Memorandum In Support Thereof by Lee E. Stephens, Jr Responses due by 3/6/2018(Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 9 EXHIBITS Vol. 6 (App. 26-43) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 8 EXHIBITS VOL. 5 (App. 22-25) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 7 EXHIBITS VOL.4 (App. 16-21) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 6 EXHIBITS VOL. 3 (App. 12-15) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 5 EXHIBITS VOL. 2 (App. 9-11) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 4 EXHIBITS VOL. 1 (App. 1-8) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/20/2018 in the amount of $5, receipt number 1086-1155242 (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas)
February 20, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $5 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling (Filing Fee due by 2/27/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2018 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachment) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
February 16, 2018 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Carpenter et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Dayena M. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen T Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee E. Stephens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?