Smith v. Maryland State Police Dept. et al

Plaintiff: Ikiem Smith
Defendant: Tfc. Ryan Boyce # 5954, Maryland State Police Dept., Sgt. Sean Harris #1537, Tfc. Justin Hohner #6281, Cpl. Michael Cox # 4760, Tfc. James Pettit #5084 and K9 Max #3322
Case Number: 1:2018cv02836
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Ikiem Smith ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/30/2018. (c/m 10/30/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ikiem Smith(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Ikiem Smith (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER giving Finance Officer at RCI 21 days to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of the Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/1/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10-01-2018)
September 12, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ikiem Smith(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Boyce # 5954, Michael Cox # 4760, Sean Harris #1537, Justin Hohner #6281, K9 Max #3322, Maryland State Police Dept., James Pettit #5084, filed by Ikiem Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Maryland State Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tfc. Ryan Boyce # 5954
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland State Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Sean Harris #1537
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tfc. Justin Hohner #6281
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Michael Cox # 4760
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tfc. James Pettit #5084
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K9 Max #3322
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ikiem Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?