Hamilton v. Washington County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Larry Hamilton
Defendant: Capt. E. Long, Washington County Detention Center, Meritus Medical Staff Correct Solutions, Sheriff Doug Mullendore, Warden C. Rowe, Washington County Board of Commissioners and Washington County Sherriffs Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv02851
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing fee: $ 6.84, receipt number 14637110438 (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Add Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/30/2018. (c/m10/31/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 9 MOTION to Compel Complaint by Larry Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 8 MOTION to Add Defendants by Larry Hamilton(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Larry Hamilton ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/12/2018. (c/m 10/15/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 6 NOTICE by E. Long, Doug Mullendore, C. Rowe, Washington County Detention Center re #3 Order Line attaching Certificate of Records (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Records Requested by the Court, #2 Attachment inmate account summary)(Karpinski, Kevin)
October 11, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bock Karpinski on behalf of E. Long, Doug Mullendore, C. Rowe, Washington County Detention Center (Karpinski, Kevin)
September 28, 2018 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Larry Hamilton (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER directing Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/17/2018. (c/m 9/17/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Hamilton(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against E. Long, Meritus Medical Staff Correct Solutions, Doug Mullendore, C. Rowe, Washington County Detention Center, filed by Larry Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Washington County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. E. Long
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Detention Center
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritus Medical Staff Correct Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Doug Mullendore
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden C. Rowe
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sherriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?