Mobley v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Daytron L. Mobley, Sr.
Defendant: C.O. II Heath Miller, C.O. II Clark and C.O. II Oaks
Case Number: 1:2018cv02856
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Correspondence received from Litigation Coordinator re: Accepting/Refusing Service. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Correspondence from Litigation Coordinator re: Accepting/Refusing Service. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daytron L. Mobley, Sr(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Daytron L. Mobley, Sr. ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/17/2018. (c/m and emailed 10/17/18) (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; giving finance officer 21 days from the date of this order to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/14/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-09142018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daytron L. Mobley, Sr(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clark, Heath Miller, Oaks, filed by Daytron L. Mobley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. II Heath Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. II Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. II Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daytron L. Mobley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?