Allstate Insurance Company v. Fields et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Otis Fields, N.B.S., Inc., Stanley Rochkind, Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership, Dear Management & Construction Company, Jack Novograd and Charles Runkles
Case Number: 1:2018cv02858
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 5:8705
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Otis Fields served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Adam)
October 17, 2018 14 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
October 15, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Dear Management & Construction Company served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 15, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Stanley Rochkind served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 15, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 15, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Jack Novograd served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 15, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. N.B.S., Inc. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 15, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Charles Runkles served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018.(Smith, Adam)
October 9, 2018 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by N.B.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NB5 Business Trust for N.B.S., Inc..(Spern, Brian)
October 9, 2018 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent UP6 Business Trust for Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership.(Spern, Brian)
October 9, 2018 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dear Management & Construction Company (Spern, Brian)
October 9, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dear Management & Construction Company, N.B.S., Inc., Jack Novograd, Stanley Rochkind, Charles Runkles, Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership.(Spern, Brian)
September 14, 2018 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dear Management & Construction Company, Otis Fields, N.B.S., Inc., Jack Novograd, Stanley Rochkind, Charles Runkles, Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Smith, Adam)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7559943.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons - Novograd, #5 Summons - Uptown, #6 Summons - N.B.S., #7 Summons - Runkles, #8 Summons - Dear, #9 Summons - Otis, #10 Summons - Rochkind)(Smith, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.B.S., Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Rochkind
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uptown Realty Co. Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dear Management & Construction Company
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Novograd
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Runkles
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?