MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Webb et al

Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Defendant: Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Penny A Webb, Sucessors of Randy Webb, Randy M. Webb, Penny A. Webb and Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv02859
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Penny A. Webb (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 13 Correspondence from Clerk to The Circuit Court for St. Mary's County regarding remanding case. (c/m 10/18/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court, case to be REMANDED to The Circuit Court for St. Mary's County Maryland. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/18/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff, MTGLQ Investors, L.P., and by Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil)
September 25, 2018 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P. was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2018 Telephone Conference held with counsel representing Plaintiff and the government on 9/25/2018 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers)
September 24, 2018 9 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MTGLQ Investors, L.P. (Tussey, Sara) Modified on 9/25/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2018 8 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Corrected - Replaces ECF No. 7) filed by Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service.(White, Neil)
September 18, 2018 7 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service.(White, Neil)
September 17, 2018 6 PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a telephone conference with counsel on Tuesday, September 25, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. Chambers will initiate the conference call. (sat, Chambers)
September 17, 2018 5 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/17/2018. (c/m 9/17/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 4 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #3 consent motion for extension of time. The government's response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by October 22, 2018 (c/e/m to T. Hawes 9/14/18 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/14/2018. (Chasanow, Deborah)
September 14, 2018 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil)
September 14, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.5(White, Neil)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for St. Mary's County, case number C-18-CV-18-00315., filed by Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Civil Case Information Report, #5 Complaint Exhibit A, #6 Complaint Exhibit B, #7 Complaint Exhibit C, #8 Complaint Exhibit D, #9 Complaint Exhibit E, #10 Complaint Exhibit F, #11 Complaint Exhibit G, #12 Complaint Exhibit H, #13 Complaint Exhibit I, #14 Complaint, #15 State Court Line)(White, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Webb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Represented By: Sara Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Neil R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny A Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sucessors of Randy Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy M. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Neil R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?