Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MBR Construction Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: GM Supply & Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02860
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 11/5/2018 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/5/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 19 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/5/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Third-Party Complaint, Summons, and Docket Nos. 1 through 17 served on Cynthia Chester, Office Manager, GM Supply & Services, Inc. (Authorized to Accept) on October 23, 2018, filed by MBR Construction Services, Inc..(Madigan, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 17 NOTICE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Local Rule 103.5 Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Madigan, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 16 Summons Issued 21 days as to GM Supply & Services, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 15 NOTICE by MBR Construction Services, Inc. re #14 Third Party Complaint (for Clerk to Issue Summons) (Madigan, Patrick)
October 5, 2018 14 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against GM Supply & Services, Inc., filed by MBR Construction Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Madigan, Patrick)
September 25, 2018 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sonepar USA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Brook Electrical Supply Company for Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC.(Shuster, Robert)
September 24, 2018 12 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
September 21, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint by MBR Construction Services, Inc..(Madigan, Patrick)
September 21, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MBR Construction Services, Inc. (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 7 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (State Court Notice of Removal) (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 6 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (State Court Information Report) (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 5 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (MBR Summons) (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 4 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (Hartford Summons) (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 3 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 2 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, MBR Construction Services, Inc. (Civil Cover Sheet) (Madigan, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland, case number 03-c-18-007672. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7560396), filed by MBR Construction Services, Inc., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Madigan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MBR Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick James Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick James Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Lighting & Supply, LLC
Represented By: Robert G Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GM Supply & Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?