Force 3, LLC v. N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Force 3, LLC
Defendant: Mittenpunkt Corporation, N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC, Greg McKeever, Alden Kuusinen and Lauren Garber
Case Number: 1:2018cv02865
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER administratively closing case, subject to reopening up to and including August 15, 2019, if necessary to enforce the injunction. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/9/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 16 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/9/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Force 3, LLC. N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018.(Hurley, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 14 NOTICE by Force 3, LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex. B - Consent Order for Permanent Injunction (Hurley, Timothy)
September 25, 2018 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Force 3, LLC. Mittenpunkt Corporation waiver sent on 9/19/2018, answer due 11/19/2018.(Hurley, Timothy)
September 25, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Force 3, LLC. Lauren Garber served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018.(Hurley, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Force 3, LLC. Alden Kuusinen served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018.(Hurley, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Force 3, LLC. Greg McKeever served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018.(Hurley, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ariel Harris. Directing attorney Ariel Harris to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Evan Sauda. Directing attorney Evan Sauda to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel E. Harris (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7564179.) by Force 3, LLC(Hurley, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Evan M. Sauda (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7564151.) by Force 3, LLC(Hurley, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lauren Garber, Alden Kuusinen, Greg McKeever, Mittenpunkt Corporation, N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Force 3, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy)
September 14, 2018 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Force 3, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy)
September 14, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Force 3, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. for Force 3, LLC.(Hurley, Timothy)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7561630.), filed by Force 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC, #14 Summons Lauren Garber, #15 Summons Greg McKeever, #16 Summons Mittenpunkt Corporation, #17 Summons Alden Kuusinen)(Hurley, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Force 3, LLC v. N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mittenpunkt Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N2Grate Government Technology Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg McKeever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden Kuusinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Force 3, LLC
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Represented By: Jonathan Singer
Represented By: Ariel E Harris
Represented By: Evan Sauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?