Gonzalez v. Spunk Industries Inc et al

Plaintiff: Vicki Gonzalez
Defendant: Jason C Jean and Spunk Industries Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv02935
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Vicki Gonzalez, Deficiency Notice - AO 120, (Gaumont, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 10/2/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jason C Jean, Spunk Industries Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Vicki Gonzalez Summonses to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gaumont, Robert)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jason C Jean, Spunk Industries Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7575223.), filed by Vicki Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Gaumont, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Spunk Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason C Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spunk Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert A Gaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?