Vandermast et al v. Sue Creek I LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Vandermast, Joanne M Vandermast, Rowena V West, Roberta Jean Vandermast, Karen J Vandermast, Roberta Jean Vandermast Crawford, Rowena Vandermast West and Karen J. Vandermast Blanchard
Defendant: Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd., Sue Creek I LLC, William W Mitcherling, Robert L Hanley, John J Mitcherling and Robert L. Hanley, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03107
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert L. Hanley, Jr, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Robert L. Hanley Jr. and Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams, Chtd.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Errata Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Frederick, Alvin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by John J Mitcherling, William W Mitcherling, Sue Creek I LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Attachment Request for Hearing, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Gerard)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Robert L. Hanley, Jr, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd. identifying Other Affiliate Cna Ins Co for Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd., Robert L. Hanley Jr..(Frederick, Alvin)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MARGINAL ORDER approving #12 Stipulation of Extension of Time filed by William W Mitcherling, Sue Creek I LLC, John J Mitcherling. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/29/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sue Creek I LLC (Martin, Gerard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by John J Mitcherling, William W Mitcherling, Sue Creek I LLC(Martin, Gerard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harris William Eisenstein on behalf of John J Mitcherling, William W Mitcherling, Sue Creek I LLC (Eisenstein, Harris)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Patrick Martin on behalf of John J Mitcherling, William W Mitcherling, Sue Creek I LLC (Martin, Gerard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Marini on behalf of Robert L. Hanley, Jr, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd. (Marini, Lauren)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin I Frederick on behalf of Robert L. Hanley, Jr, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd. (Frederick, Alvin)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Marginal ORDER APPROVING re #6 Stipulation filed by Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd., Robert L. Hanley, Jr.; Robert L. Hanley, Jr answer due 11/27/2018; Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd. answer due 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/24/2018. (c/m: L. Marini)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time by Robert L. Hanley, Jr, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd.(Marini, Lauren)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to John J Mitcherling.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ernest Vandermast, Joanne M Vandermast, Karen J. Vandermast Blanchard, Roberta Jean Vandermast Crawford, Rowena Vandermast West re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet and Amended Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gauvey, Kenneth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Robert L. Hanley, Jr, William W Mitcherling, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd., Sue Creek I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Karen J. Vandermast Blanchard, Ernest Vandermast, Roberta Jean Vandermast Crawford, Rowena Vandermast West, Joanne M Vandermast was filed missing information. **Please file a Civil Cover Sheet and a summons for John J. Mitcherling using the event Notice (Other) and link to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert L Hanley, John J Mitcherling, William W Mitcherling, Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd., Sue Creek I LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7604855.), filed by Joanne M Vandermast, Rowena V West, Ernest Vandermast, Roberta Jean Vandermast, Karen J Vandermast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement, #2 Summons Proposed Summons 1, #3 Summons Proposed Summons 2, #4 Summons Proposed Summons 3, #5 Summons Proposed Summons 4, #6 Summons Proposed Summons 5)(Gauvey, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandermast et al v. Sue Creek I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Vandermast
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne M Vandermast
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena V West
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Jean Vandermast
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen J Vandermast
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Jean Vandermast Crawford
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena Vandermast West
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen J. Vandermast Blanchard
Represented By: Kenneth Christopher Gauvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan, Plumhoff & Williams Chtd.
Represented By: Alvin I Frederick
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Creek I LLC
Represented By: Gerard Patrick Martin
Represented By: Harris William Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W Mitcherling
Represented By: Gerard Patrick Martin
Represented By: Harris William Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Mitcherling
Represented By: Gerard Patrick Martin
Represented By: Harris William Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Hanley, Jr.
Represented By: Alvin I Frederick
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?