Horsey v. Chespeake Detention Facility

Plaintiff: Kevin Horsey
Defendant: Chespeake Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2018cv03130
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Kevin Horsey ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m 11/28/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin Horsey(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin Horsey(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin Horsey(bas, Deputy Clerk) .
October 29, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/29/2018. (c/m 10/29/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Horsey(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days to either pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/11/2018. (c/m & IFP form 10/12/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Chespeake Detention Facility, filed by Kevin Horsey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsey v. Chespeake Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Horsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chespeake Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?