Fishback v. Graham

Plaintiff: John William Fishback, lll
Defendant: Richard Graham
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2018cv03152
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 10 Correspondence form Plaintiff(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 9 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by John William Fishback, lll (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 8 REPLY re #6 Response filed by John William Fishback, lll. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2018 7 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by John William Fishback, lll (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 6 RESPONSE re #2 Order filed by Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and documents)(Dernoga, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 5 MOTION to Appoint Legal Counsel by Affidavit by John William Fishback, lll. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to and including October 29, 2018 by Office of the Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dernoga, Thomas)
October 12, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Dernoga on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Dernoga, Thomas)
October 12, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER directing Counsel to show cause within 14 days why injunctive relief should not be granted in favor of Mr. Fishback. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/11/2018. (c/m & emailed 10/12/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Graham, filed by John William Fishback. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fishback v. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Fishback, lll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Thomas E Dernoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?