Ovalle v. Chesapeak Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Luis Garza Ovalle
Defendant: Bureau Of Prisons, U S Marshal Service and Chesapeak Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv03172
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2018. (c/m 11/21/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days to file a supplement to the complaint and to pay filing fee or file Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/15/2018. (c/m & 1983 form 10/15/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 3 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 5:18-cv-01309. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 10, 2018 2 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER: Pursuant to the authority granted in 28 U.S.C. 1406, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER the above captioned case to the United States District Court for Maryland, the district in which the alleged cause of action arose. See 28 U.S.C. 1391. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/10/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 4, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Prisons, Chesapeak Detention Center, U S Marshal Service filed by Luis Garza Ovalle. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovalle v. Chesapeak Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeak Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Garza Ovalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?