Barczak v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark M Barczak
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03179
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 24 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 10, 2018 23 Featured Case ORDER Confirming results of the conference held on November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 22 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated LIstings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 3, 2018 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/28/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, FCRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 50. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 28, 2018 20 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Terry Botkin.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Davis, Alex)
November 26, 2018 19 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases(, #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 26, 2018 18 Correspondence re: Parties' Proposed Agenda for November 28, 2018 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
November 26, 2018 17 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 11. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/26/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 16 Correspondence re: Proposed Deposition Protocol (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Deposition Protocol - CMO 11)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
November 19, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER in BHR Track Actions granting in part and denying in part (795) Motion to Dismiss Claims as Time-Barred in case 1:17-md-02775-CCB. The Plaintiffs are Granted Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 14 MEMORANDUM in BHR Track Actions. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 13 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 15, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER in all actions re: deposition protocols. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 11 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 60. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 14, 2018 10 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 48 transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2018 9 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 5, 2018 8 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 2, 2018 7 Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Protocol (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
November 2, 2018 6 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
October 29, 2018 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 26, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER in all Actions Directing Parties that no later than November 2, 2018 each shall file a letter brief outlining the areas of disagreement, and attaching their proposed version of a Deposition Protocol. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 3 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 15, 2018 2 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 15, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 1:17-md-02775-CCB. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7613570.), filed by Mark M Barczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mapes, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barczak v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M Barczak
Represented By: William H Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?