Sims v. Baltimore City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Luis Allen Sims
Defendant: Baltimore City Police Department, Captain John J. MacGillivary, Jane Doe, John Doe, Stuart O. Simms, Detective Gary T Dunnigan, Shelby Dickerson Moore and Morris Lee Kaplan
Case Number: 1:2018cv03205
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER returning unfiled document to Mr. Sims. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 12/14/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing without prejudice Stuart O. Simms, Shelby Dickerson Moore, and Morris Lee Kaplan and all remaining claims. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/30/2018. (c/m 10/31/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/30/2018. (c/m 10/31/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luis Allen Sims(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore City Police Department, Jane Doe, John Doe, Gary T Dunnigan, Morris Lee Kaplan, John J. MacGillivary, Shelby Dickerson Moore, Stuart O. Simms, filed by Luis Allen Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibits 5-8, #3 Exhibits 9-12, #4 Exhibits 13-15, #5 Exhibits 16-19, #6 Attachment, #7 Envelope)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Baltimore City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain John J. MacGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart O. Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Gary T Dunnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Dickerson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Lee Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Allen Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?