Andiamo Holdings, LLC
Petitioner: Andiamo Holdings, LLC
Claimant: Dedi Whitaker, Innes Kasanof, Hugh M. Smallwood, Jr. and Karen F. Smallwood
Case Number: 1:2018cv03211
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 CLAIM for Property by Innes Kasanof, Dedi Whitaker. (Brook, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CLAIM for Property by Hugh M. Smallwood, Jr, Karen F. Smallwood. (Brook, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Innes Kasanof, Hugh M. Smallwood, Jr, Karen F. Smallwood, Dedi Whitaker.(Brook, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brook, Robert Brooke Hopkins on behalf of Hugh M. Smallwood, Jr, Karen F. Smallwood, Dedi Whitaker, Innes Kasanof (Brook, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Check Received on 10/26/2018 from Bonner Kiernan Trebaj & Crociata LLP (FBO Andiamo Holdings, LLC). Check Number: 73562. Amount: $1000.00. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING the issuance of Notice to claimants and STAYING proceedings against Petitioner outside this action. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/17/2018. (sat, Chambers)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER approving ad interim stipulation for value. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/17/2018. (sat, Chambers)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Andiamo Holdings, LLC (Samarin, Eugene)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Accept Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, and for the Entry of Restraining Order and Order for Issuance of Notice by Andiamo Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Stipulation of Value, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Stay)(Samarin, Eugene)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability - Verified against Andiamo Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7617747.), filed by Andiamo Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Value of Vessel, #3 Supplement Notice of Complaint)(Samarin, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andiamo Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andiamo Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eugene Samarin
Represented By: Carlos Andres Uria
Represented By: John Christopher Nosher
Represented By: Todd DeLear Lochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dedi Whitaker
Represented By: Michael Brook
Represented By: Robert Brooke Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Innes Kasanof
Represented By: Michael Brook
Represented By: Robert Brooke Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hugh M. Smallwood, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Brook
Represented By: Robert Brooke Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Karen F. Smallwood
Represented By: Michael Brook
Represented By: Robert Brooke Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?