Copenhaver, Jr. et al v. Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr. and Christina Copenhaver
Defendant: Bruce Edwards, M.D., Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC and Hagerstown Surgery Center LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03277
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MARGINAL ORDER approving #14 Motion to Continue Telephone Conference on 12/18/18; postponing conference call until further notice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/17/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Continue Telephone Conference on 12/18/18 by Christina Copenhaver, Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr.(Stringer, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARGINAL ORDER approving #12 Plaintiff's Statement Clarifying Citizenship of Members of Defendant LLCs and Request for Additional Time for Preliminary Discovery Regarding Hagerstown Surgery. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/4/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #3 Order, and Request to Extend Time for Preliminary Discovery regarding Hagerstown Surgery Center filed by Christina Copenhaver, Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr..(Stringer, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr., Christina Copenhaver. Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018.(Stringer, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr., Christina Copenhaver. Hagerstown Surgery Center LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018.(Stringer, Daniel)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/30/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia J. Gipe on behalf of Bruce Edwards, MD (Gipe, Alicia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr., Christina Copenhaver. Bruce Edwards, MD served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018.(Stringer, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service, filed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons returned executed". It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Qualified Expert with Report, Order of Transfer, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents served on Shadonna E. Hale, Esq., Attorney for Defendant, Bruce Edwards, M.D. on 11/12/2018, filed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr..(Stringer, Daniel) Modified on 11/28/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC, Bruce Edwards, MD.(Hale, Shadonna)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to submit a statement clarifying the citizenship of the members of defendants Robinwood Orthopaedic and Hagerstown Surgery for diversity purposes by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/19/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC, Bruce Edwards, MD, Hagerstown Surgery Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7632531.), filed by Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr., Christina Copenhaver. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #10 Attachment Dr. Collier CQE, #11 Attachment Dr. Collier Report, #12 Attachment Order of Transfer, #13 Summons Ctrs for Adv Ortho Summons, #14 Summons Hagerstown Surgery Center Summons, #15 Summons Dr. Edwards Summons)(Stringer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copenhaver, Jr. et al v. Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Edwards, M.D.
Represented By: Alicia J. Gipe
Represented By: Shadonna E Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC
Represented By: Shadonna E Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagerstown Surgery Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W Copenhaver, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin S Salsbury
Represented By: Daniel P Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Copenhaver
Represented By: Benjamin S Salsbury
Represented By: Daniel P Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?