McMillan-McCartney v. McMillan, Jr.

Plaintiff: Elizabeth McMillan-McCartney
Defendant: Caldwell McMillan, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03331
Filed: October 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth McMillan-McCartney. Caldwell McMillan, Jr. served on 12/15/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melehy, Omar)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/29/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Caldwell McMillan, Jr. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Balashov on behalf of Elizabeth McMillan-McCartney (Balashov, Andrew)
October 28, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7640131.), filed by Elizabeth McMillan-McCartney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melehy, Suvita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan-McCartney v. McMillan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell McMillan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth McMillan-McCartney
Represented By: Andrew G. Balashov
Represented By: Suvita Chiman Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?