Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. v. International Longshoremen's Association, ALF-CIO, Local 333
Plaintiff: Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc.
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association, ALF-CIO, Local 333
Case Number: 1:2018cv03338
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARGINAL ORDER approving #12 Joint Status Report filed by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/1/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Joint by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc.(Collins, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing parties to file a joint status report by 12 p.m. on 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/31/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Check Received on 10/30/2018 from Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. Check Number: 62983. Amount: $2500.00. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER re #9 Order GRANTING Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/30/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/30/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2018 Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2018 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO. Directing plaintiff shall provide security in the amount of $2,500 to pay the costs and damages sustained by any party found to have been wrongfully enjoined or restrained, due by the close of business on October 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/29/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 QC NOTICE re: #5 Motion for TRO filed by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. was filed in error. **Proposed Order was filed as a motion in error. The Clerk has terminated the motion and made edits to entry. No further action required. In the future, please use Notice (Other) and link the proposed order to the original motion. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to International Longshoremen's Association, ALF-CIO, Local 333.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. Summons (Collins, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED Temporary Restraining Order by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc.(Collins, Michael) Modified on 10/29/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint, filed by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. **The following attachments is missing - completed summons. To correct this problem, file completed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link completed summons to #1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G Esders on behalf of Local 333, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO (Esders, Brian)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against Local 333, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7641912.), filed by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc. v. International Longshoremen's Association, ALF-CIO, Local 333
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association, ALF-CIO, Local 333
Represented By: Brian G Esders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?