Payne v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Derrell Payne
Defendant: S. Bonner, F. Miller, Gilpin, C. Jones, Fon, W. Thomas and J. Wolford
Case Number: 1:2018cv03418
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Derrell Payne ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m 12/28/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derrell Payne(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration within 21 days. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/11/2018. (c/m 12/12/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) .
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derrell Payne(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrell Payne(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Correspondence received from Derrell Payne re: Request for Court forms. (ba, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff 21 days to either pay the filing fee or to file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/7/2018. (c/m 11/8/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S. Bonner, Fon, Gilpin, C. Jones, F. Miller, W. Thomas, J. Wolford, filed by Derrell Payne. (Attachments: #1 Request)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrell Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?