Adams v. Stewart et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Adams
Defendant: S. Sheetz, Solomon Hejirika, A. Edmonds, Director of Volunteers of America, Inc., F. Hershberger and T.S. Stewart
Case Number: 1:2018cv03420
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/27/2018. (c/m 12/27/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by A. Edmonds, Solomon Hejirika, F. Hershberger, S. Sheetz, T.S. Stewart (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address beginning 1/23/2019 by Daniel Lee Adams. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address as of 1/3/2019 by Daniel Lee Adams (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to A. Edmonds, Solomon Hejirika, F. Hershberger, S. Sheetz, T.S. Stewart.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Lee Adams (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Correspondence received from Daniel Lee Adams re: Request for Extension of Time. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel Lee Adams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of A. Edmonds, F. Hershberger, S. Sheetz, T.S. Stewart (LeDuc, Vickie)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Lee Adams ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/7/2018. (c/m 11/7/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Lee Adams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Director of Volunteers of America, Inc., A. Edmonds, Solomon Hejirika, F. Hershberger, S. Sheetz, T.S. Stewart, filed by Daniel Lee Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sheetz
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Hejirika
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Edmonds
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Volunteers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hershberger
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.S. Stewart
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?