Murray v. DPSCS-CIT et al

Plaintiff: Tyler W. Murray
Defendant: SOG and DPSCS-CIT
Case Number: 1:2018cv03442
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days to file a complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/28/2018. (c/m & 1983 form 12/28/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyler W. Murray(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order without prejudice; granting Murray 21 days to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay filing fee. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/19/2018. (c/m & 1983 form 11/19/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DPSCS-CIT, SOG, filed by Tyler W. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. DPSCS-CIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPSCS-CIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler W. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?