James v. Warden

Plaintiff: Phillip James
Defendant: Warden, Andrew Moltrie and Patuxent Institute Medical Staff
Case Number: 1:2018cv03449
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 6 Featured Case ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing the complaint without prejudice; clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/2/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-01-02-2019)
November 27, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Granting the plaintiff 21 days to file an updated Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis using pre-printed forms used by non-prisoners. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/27/2018. (c/m 11/28/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Warden(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2018 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Phillip James (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to file a Supplement to the Complaint and to either pay the filing fee or to file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/9/2018. (c/m 11/09/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by Phillip James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Moltrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patuxent Institute Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?