Beavers v. Extended Stay America, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Katlyn Beavers
Defendant: ESA Management, LLC and Extended Stay America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03466
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Murphy. Directing attorney James Murphy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 6 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James J. Murphy by ESA Management, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. The fee has already been paid. Receipt No. 0416-7714551. (Douglas, Ebony) Modified on 12/7/2018 (srd, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint ESA Management, and Extended Stay America, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/4/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ESA Management, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglas, Ebony)
December 4, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ebony Reid Douglas on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Douglas, Ebony)
November 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to ESA Management, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ESA Management, LLC)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7663932.), filed by katlyn beavers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ESA Summons, #3 Summons ESA Managment Summons)(Griffin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers v. Extended Stay America, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katlyn Beavers
Represented By: Edward Nelson Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA Management, LLC
Represented By: James Murphy
Represented By: Ebony Reid Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay America, Inc.
Represented By: James Murphy
Represented By: Ebony Reid Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?