Koster v. Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC

Plaintiff: Frank Koster
Defendant: Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03467
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Markham Richard Leventhal. Directing attorney Markham Richard Leventhal to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Markham R. Leventhal by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Merten, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/18/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Markham R. Leventhal (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7737586.) by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC(Merten, William)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #10 Order, Set Deadlines by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merten, William)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING #9 Stipulation filed by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC. Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC answer extended through and including 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/29/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, "Joint Stipulation To Extension Of Time" by Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC(Merten, William)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Glenn Merten on behalf of Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC (Merten, William)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/9/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Frank Koster re #2 MOTION to Seal Proposed Order (MacCumbee, Kimberly)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit A to the Complaint by Frank Koster re #2 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint, (MacCumbee, Kimberly)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion to Seal filed by Frank Koster was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed sealed document. To correct this problem, file the Proposed sealed document using the event Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by Frank Koster (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MacCumbee, Kimberly)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7664029.), filed by Frank Koster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A To Be Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(MacCumbee, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koster v. Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Koster
Represented By: Kimberly Sue MacCumbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegon USA Realty Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Markham Richard Leventhal
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?