Strube v. Idema et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Strube
Defendant: Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A., DO Jocelyn Idema, Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. d/b/a Orthopedic Associates of Frederick and Jocelyn Idema, D.O.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03527
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Andrew Nace on behalf of Jamie Strube (Nace, Matthew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia J. Gipe on behalf of Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. (Gipe, Alicia)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jocelyn Idema, DO, Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A., Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. d/b/a Orthopedic Associates of Frederick Line attaching CQE & Report of Neal Naff, MD (Attachments: #1 Attachment Naff's CQE & Report)(McAfee, Larry)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A., Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. d/b/a Orthopedic Associates of Frederick.(Hale, Shadonna)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jocelyn Idema, DO.(McAfee, Larry)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jocelyn Idema, DO, Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A., Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. d/b/a Orthopedic Associates of Frederick.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7671139.), filed by Jamie Strube. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nace, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strube v. Idema et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Strube
Represented By: Matthew Andrew Nace
Represented By: Barry J Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Alicia J. Gipe
Represented By: Shadonna E Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO Jocelyn Idema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nisenfeld & Chilton, M.D., P.A. d/b/a Orthopedic Associates of Frederick
Represented By: Shadonna E Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Idema, D.O.
Represented By: Larry D McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?