Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Pensare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Defendant: Donato Sauro and Pensare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03528
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 -[FILED IN ERROR]- Deficiency Notice as to JLN Construction Services, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 1/18/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/11/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 Status Hearing held on 1/2/2019 re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Martin Giordano-5D) (chs, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 WRIT of Replevin issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 Supplemental to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin (Greenberg, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pensare, LLC, Donato Sauro.(Lichtenstein, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pensare, LLC (Lichtenstein, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Lichtenstein on behalf of Pensare, LLC, Donato Sauro (Lichtenstein, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/20/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2018: #1 Attachment) (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin Proposed Consent Order (Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Notice of hearing scheduled 11/21/18 to parties (Cassilly, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. All Defendants.(Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation re #9 Certificate of Counsel (Cassilly, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 (b)(1)(B) by Matthew Bruce Cassilly on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cassilly, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin Corrected Proposed Writ of Replevin (Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin Corrected Proposed Order to Show Cause and TRO (Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Replevin by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause and TRO, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ of Replevin)(Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pensare, LLC, Donato Sauro. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/15/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation or counsel for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/29/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Renault, S.A. for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation.(Greenberg, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7672069.), filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Greenberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Pensare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donato Sauro
Represented By: Michael J Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pensare, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Matthew Bruce Cassilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?