Montgomery County, Maryland et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Prince George's County, Maryland and Montgomery County, Maryland
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC, Bank of America, N.A. and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03575
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331cr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/11/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Countrywide Financial Corporation waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Countrywide Bank, FSB waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Bank of America Corporation waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019.(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Hefferon on behalf of BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc. (Hefferon, Thomas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/21/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland or counsel for Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/5/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7683290.), filed by Montgomery County, Maryland, Prince George's County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Bank of America Corporation, #10 Summons Bank of America, N.A., #11 Summons Countrywide Financial Corporation, #12 Summons Countrywide Home Loans, #13 Summons Countrywide Bank, FSB, #14 Summons Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC, #15 Summons BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, #16 Summons Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., #17 Summons Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc., #18 Summons Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.)(Freeman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery County, Maryland et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, FSB
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince George's County, Maryland
Represented By: Jean Mary Zachariasiewicz
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery County, Maryland
Represented By: Jean Mary Zachariasiewicz
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?