Cannady et al v. State of Missouri et al

Plaintiff: John Doe, Vincent Cannady and Jane Doe
Defendant: Brandon Qusley, State of Missouri, Aaron Hart, University of Missouri Kansas City, Angela M. Bennett, Michael Garvin, John Herron, Willis Doss, Jennifer Friend, Dennis Merrill, State of Missouri Administrative Hearing Commission, Hugh C. Jenkin, Lorraine Brockmann, Dianne Mutti-Burke, Denis Medieros, County of Bates, Douglas P. Munro, Mel Tyler and University of Missouri Board of Curators
Case Number: 1:2018cv03633
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the USDC Western District of Missouri (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Clerk to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint to add and dismiss defendants by Vincent Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #4 Order re: Right to Sue Letter filed by Vincent Cannady.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Material Evidence to #6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief filed by Vincent Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Supplement in support re #6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief filed by Vincent Cannady (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re proposed summons by Vincent Cannady (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief by Vincent Cannady (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Affidavit)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Vincent Cannady (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting plaintiff fourteen days to file a copy of the "Right to Sue Letter". Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/29/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Vincent Cannady, Jane Doe, John Doe. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vincent Cannady (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angela M. Bennett, Lorraine Brockmann, County of Bates, Willis Doss, Jennifer Friend, Michael Garvin, Aaron Hart, John Herron, Hugh C. Jenkin, Denis Medieros, Dennis Merrill, Douglas P. Munro, Dianne Mutti-Burke, Brandon Qusley, State of Missouri, State of Missouri Administrative Hearing Commission, Mel Tyler, University of Missouri Board of Curators, University of Missouri Kansas City, filed by Vincent Cannady, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannady et al v. State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Qusley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Missouri Kansas City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri Administrative Hearing Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh C. Jenkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Brockmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Mutti-Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Medieros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Missouri Board of Curators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?