Molina et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angel Molina and Amanda Molina
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03647
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 MDL Certified ORDER VACATING Conditional Transfer Order. Signed by Jeffrey N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/11/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MARGINAL ORDER granting #6 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/4/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.(Redmond, Robert)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/29/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re #3 Notice of Removal,, Proof of Notice of Removal and Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Redmond, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Notice of Removal from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number 080400333142018., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7694622), filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Notice to Clerk of Removal to Federal Court, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C to Removal)(Redmond, Robert) Modified on 11/29/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc. for Lumber Liquidators, Inc..(Redmond, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 [FILED IN ERROR - atty to refile] NOTICE OF REMOVAL Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Notice of Removal from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number 080400333142018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7694622), filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Redmond, Robert) Modified on 11/29/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F Redmond, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Molina
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Molina
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?