Abler v. City Of Baltimore et al

Plaintiff: Stanley Abler
Defendant: Baltimore City Fire Department and City Of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2018cv03668
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Request for Conference (Curry, Samuel)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures) (c/m 1/28/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore.(Curry, Samuel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #8 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore was filed incorrectly. **No answer has previously been filed in the case, therefore this would not be considered an "Amended Answer." Please correct document and file using the correct event, "Answer to Complaint". It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore (Curry, Samuel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] AMENDED ANSWER to by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore. (Curry, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Answer to Complaint filed by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore was filed incorrectly. **Title of document states it is an answer to a second amended complaint. There is no such document in this case, only the original complaint exists. Please correct document to reflect proper association. Also, the attached Local Rule 103.3 disclosure does not pertain to a party in this case. If it is corrected and refiled, do not attach to the Answer. It is a separate entry. Use the event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure." It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Disclosure of Corp. Interests)(Curry, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Abler. Baltimore City Fire Department served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; City Of Baltimore served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Baltimore City Fire Department)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Abler 21 days to complete U.S. Marshal forms and return them to Clerk. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/12/2018. (c/m 12/13/18) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stanley Abler(jb5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore City Fire Department, City Of Baltimore, filed by Stanley Abler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jb5s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abler v. City Of Baltimore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Fire Department
Represented By: Samuel Lamont Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Baltimore
Represented By: Samuel Lamont Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Abler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?