Allegis Group, Inc. v. Allegis Capital, LLC

Plaintiff: Allegis Group, Inc.
Defendant: Allegis Capital, LLC d/b/a AllegisCyber and Allegis Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03774
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Allegis Capital, LLC answer due 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/28/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Allegis Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Consent Order)(Tayman, William)
January 28, 2019 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Allegis Capital, LLC (Tayman, William)
January 28, 2019 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kyle Tayman on behalf of Allegis Capital, LLC (Tayman, William)
January 17, 2019 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allegis Group, Inc.. Allegis Capital, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019.(Flax, Sherry)
December 18, 2018 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Allegis Group, Inc. (Flax, Sherry)
December 12, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/19/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Flax, Sherry)
December 10, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 12/17/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Allegis Capital, LLC.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Allegis Capital, LLC d/b/a AllegisCyber ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7715403.), filed by Allegis Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Flax, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegis Group, Inc. v. Allegis Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegis Capital, LLC d/b/a AllegisCyber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegis Capital, LLC
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegis Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry H Flax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?