Livingston Asset Management LLC v. GME Innotainment, Inc.

Plaintiff: Livingston Asset Management LLC
Defendant: GME Innotainment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03780
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
0 Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
1 Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 18 Fairness Hearing held on 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher.(FTR KLEIN -7C.) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 12/17/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion. The Parties and Counsel for the Defendant may attend the Fairness Hearing via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 12/14/2018. (vals, Chambers)
December 14, 2018 15 Joint MOTION for Other Relief to Allow Parties to Attend Hearing via Telephone by Livingston Asset Management LLC(Stout, Matheau)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER granting #10 Joint motion to schedule a hearing. A Fairness Hearing has been scheduled for Monday, December 17, 2018 at 1:30pm in courtroom 7C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 12/14/2018. (vals, Chambers)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. The telephone conference scheduled for January 8, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. has been cancelled. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/14/2018. (kw, Chambers)
December 14, 2018 11 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stout, Matheau)
December 14, 2018 10 Joint MOTION for Other Relief to Schedule Hearing Before Magistrate Judge by Livingston Asset Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Stout, Matheau)
December 14, 2018 9 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stout, Matheau)
December 13, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM to Counsel setting date for conference call for January 8, 2019, at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/13/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by GME Innotainment, Inc. (Allen, Glen)
December 12, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GME Innotainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(Allen, Glen)
December 10, 2018 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to GME Innotainment, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 4 NOTICE by Livingston Asset Management LLC re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Civil Cover Sheet and Summons)(Stout, Matheau)
December 10, 2018 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Livingston Asset Management LLC (Stout, Matheau)
December 7, 2018 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Livingston Asset Management LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Deficiency Notice as to Livingston Asset Management LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/14/2018 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against GME Innotainment, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7715823.), filed by Livingston Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Stout, Matheau)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston Asset Management LLC v. GME Innotainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GME Innotainment, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Keith Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livingston Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Matheau J. W. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?