Maldini et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Maldini, Kathleen Frakes Hevenber, Tamara Wallace and Kathleen Frakes Hevener
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03841
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 51 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/22/2020. (el2s, Chambers)
March 30, 2020 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 47 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND ADDRESS Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-03841-PWG; granting (393) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Bruce Poole, Sr terminated in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/19/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 1:18-cv-03841-PWG(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 1:18-cv-03841-PWG(Poole, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 41 Correspondence re: Bellwether Selection Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint ESI Protocol by Gretchen Ehle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Alternative Service by Yisroel MannAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Schlachet, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Donna Hiteshew of Withdrawal of Eve Lynn J. Rapp from Consumer Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by Katrina Carroll Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Carroll, Katrina)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and FRE(D) and (E) CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Appointing Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas P Mann on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 1:18-cv-03841-PWG(Mann, Jonas)
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 29 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Travis on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
March 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Johnsgard on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 3 Transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Smiley on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 1:18-cv-03841-PWG(Smiley, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Fernandes on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 1:18-cv-03841-PWG(Fernandes, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Bourne on behalf of Dianne King Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Bourne, Joseph)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 MDL Certified Transfer Order No. 2 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 MDL Certified Transfer Order No. 1 Transferring the cases listed to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER clarifying that the process and deadline for applying for the positions of plaintiffs' lead counsel, liaison counsel, and steering committee will be discussed at the Case Management Conference on April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/19/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(lmys, Chambers)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bruce Poole, Sr on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace (Poole, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Tellis on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Tellis, Roland)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by David Sparks, Peter Tapling Acceptance of Appointment as Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER transferring this case to MDL 2879. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/14/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER suspending proceedings in this case pending a decision by the JPML on the motion to transfer and consolidate. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Other Relief Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Suspending Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa M Ghannoum. Directing attorney Lisa M Ghannoum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel R Warren. Directing attorney Daniel R Warren to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa M. Ghannoum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7754635.) by Marriott International, Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel R. Warren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7754632.) by Marriott International, Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Maldini. All Defendants.(Poole, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Roland Tellis. Attorney Roland Tellis will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Roland K. Tellis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7737885.) by Peter Maldini(Poole, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7728018),filed by Peter Maldini, Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Tamara Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bruce Poole, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Poole, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldini et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Maldini
Represented By: David Bruce Poole, Sr.
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David B. Fernandes
Represented By: Jonas P Mann
Represented By: Elizabeth Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Frakes Hevenber
Represented By: David Bruce Poole, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Wallace
Represented By: David Bruce Poole, Sr.
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David B. Fernandes
Represented By: Jonas P Mann
Represented By: Elizabeth Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Frakes Hevener
Represented By: David Bruce Poole, Sr.
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David B. Fernandes
Represented By: Jonas P Mann
Represented By: Elizabeth Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?