Barrett et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Barrett, Jr., Estate of Tracie Ward, Laura Rollins, Karen Weddle, Jennifer Harrison, Patricia Barrett and Christopher Barrett
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Lofton Corporation, Hopeman Brothers, Inc,, The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Crane Co., Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachiners Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, Wayne Manufacturing Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., MCIC Inc., Cooper Industries, LLC, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, John Crane Inc., Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.,, Inc. Lloyd E. Mitchell, The William Powell Company, Beazer East, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ferro Engineering Division of On Marine Services Company, Alfa Laval Inc., CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corp., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Hampshire Industries, Inc., S.B. Decking Inc., International Paper Co., Viking Pump Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, General Electric Co., A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, International Paper Company, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co., Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv03911
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Mears on behalf of The Nash Engineering Company (Mears, Rebekah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE re #77 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint excerpts), #2 Exhibit B (Herfel Affidavit), #3 Exhibit C (Milspec, 250-000), #4 Exhibit D (1507E excerpts), #5 Exhibit E (Forman Report), #6 Exhibit F (ATI excerpts))(Maisano, Clare)
February 5, 2019 Filing 79 QC NOTICE: #78 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by The Nash Engineering Company was filed incorrectly. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. It should be filed using the event under Notices -> Notice of Appearance. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 78 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Hamilton, Michael) Modified on 2/5/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 25, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher Barrett, Patricia Barrett, Jennifer Harrison, Laura Rollins, Karen Weddle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiely, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 76 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Haslup, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 75 QC NOTICE: #72 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by S.B. Decking Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and all corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 74 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate Electric Insurance Company for General Electric Company.(Haslup, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 73 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate Electric Insurance Company for General Electric Company.(Haslup, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 15, 2019 Filing 72 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by S.B. Decking Inc. (Loker, F) Modified on 1/15/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 15, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by F Ford Loker, Jr on behalf of S.B. Decking Inc. (Loker, F)
January 15, 2019 Filing 70 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux Holdings, Inc. for Copes-Vulcan, Inc..(Silver, Robin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Silver on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Inc. (Silver, Robin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 68 (FLED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric Company.(Haslup, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 14, 2019 Filing 67 QC NOTICE: #66 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 66 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Haslup, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 11, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Haslup on behalf of General Electric Company (Haslup, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 64 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation for Viking Pump Inc..(Goldberg, Terri)
January 4, 2019 Filing 63 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The William Powell Company (Palmiotto, Vincent)
January 4, 2019 Filing 62 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCIC Inc. (Grenzer, Louis)
January 4, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J Palmiotto on behalf of The William Powell Company (Palmiotto, Vincent)
January 4, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis E Grenzer, Jr on behalf of MCIC Inc. (Grenzer, Louis)
January 2, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri Lynn Goldberg on behalf of Hampshire Industries, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc,, Viking Pump Inc. (Goldberg, Terri)
December 28, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by CBS Corporation.(Kulinski, Philip)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Plaintiffs' motion to remand due 1/25/19. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/27/2018. (vdcs, Chambers)
December 27, 2018 Filing 56 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Westlock Controls Corporation, Other Affiliate Crane GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane International Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Aerospace, Inc., Other Affiliate ELDEC Corporation, Other Affiliate ELDEC France S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate Hydro-Aire, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane (Asia Pacific) Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Controls, Inc., Other Affiliate Barksdale, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Resistoflex GmbH, Other Affiliate CR Holdings C.V., Other Affiliate Crane Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate P.T. Crane Indonesia, Other Affiliate Crane Holdings (Germany) GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies S.P.R.L., Other Affiliate Xomox Hungary Kft., Other Affiliate Xomox Japan Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane International Capital S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Crane Canada Co., Other Affiliate Crane Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Merchandising Systems Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies Ltd., Other Affiliate ELDEC Electronics Ltd., Other Affiliate Interpoint S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate Crane Composites, Inc., Other Affiliate MCC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Environmental Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Nuclear, Inc., Other Affiliate Xomox Corporation, Other Affiliate Xomox Sanmar Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox Chihuahua S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Xomox Corporation de Venezuela C.A., Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies S.r.l., Other Affiliate ARDAC Inc., Other Affiliate Armature d.o.o., Other Affiliate Automatic Products (UK) Ltd., Other Affiliate B. Rhodes & Son Ltd., Other Affiliate Barksdale GmbH, Other Affiliate CA-MC Acquisition UK Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Controls International Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Overseas Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Pension Trustees Ltd., Other Affiliate Conlux Matsumoto Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Composites Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Electronics Corporation, Other Affiliate Crane Electronics, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane European Financing LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Fengqiu Zhejiang Pump Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Fluid & Gas Systems (Suzhou) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Global Holdings S.L., Other Affiliate Crane International Trading (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Merger Co. LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Middle East & Africa FZE, Other Affiliate Crane Ningjin Valve Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane North America Funding LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Overseas, LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Pension Trustee Company (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies (India) Pvt. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane SC Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Stockham Valve. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Yongxiang (Ningbo) Valve Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Croning Livarna d.o.o., Other Affiliate Delta Fluid Products Ltd., Other Affiliate Donald Brown (Brownall) Ltd., Other Affiliate Flow Technology Inc., Other Affiliate Friedrich Krombach GmbH Armaturenwerke, Other Affiliate Hattersly Newman Hender Ltd., Other Affiliate Inta-Lok Ltd., Other Affiliate Interpoint U.K. Limited, Other Affiliate MEI Australia LLC, Other Affiliate MEI Auto Payment System (Shanghai) Ltd., Other Affiliate MEI Conlux Holdings (Japan), Inc., Other Affiliate MEI Conlux Holdings (US), Inc., Other Affiliate MEI de Mexico LLC, Other Affiliate MEI Payment Systems Hong Kong Ltd., Other Affiliate MEI Queretaro S. de R.L. de CV, Other Affiliate Merrimac Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Mondais Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Money Controls Argentina SA, Other Affiliate Money Controls Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Multi-Mix Microtechnology SRL, Other Affiliate NABIC Valve Safety Products Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Conlux Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Noble Composites, Inc., Other Affiliate Pegler Hattersly Ltd., Other Affiliate Sperryn & Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Terminal Manufacturing Co., Other Affiliate Triangle Valve Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Unidynamics / Phoenix, Inc., Other Affiliate Viking Johnson Ltd., Other Affiliate W.T. Armatur GmbH, Other Affiliate Wade Couplings Ltd., Other Affiliate Wask Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox France S.A.S., Other Affiliate Xomox International GmbH & Co. OHG, Other Affiliate Xomox Southeast Asia Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Ireland Ventures Designated Activity Company, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations International Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Sarl, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Srl, Other Affiliate Crane Valves India Pvt. Ltd., Other Affiliate Microtonic AG, Other Affiliate Pandora Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Yilme Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate CPI-Kiev LLC for Crane Co..(MacDonald, Neil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Remand by Christopher Barrett, Patricia Barrett, Jennifer Harrison, Laura Rollins, Karen Weddle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiely, Matthew)
December 27, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A Kulinski on behalf of International Paper Company (Kulinski, Philip)
December 27, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Maisano on behalf of International Paper Company (Maisano, Clare)
December 27, 2018 Filing 52 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company identifying Other Affiliate Interstate Fire & Casualty, ISLIC & International (TRG), Other Affiliate Northbrook/Allstate Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Associated Indemnity (Firemans Fund) for International Paper Company.(Maisano, Clare)
December 26, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Schofield on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Schofield, Rachelle)
December 26, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Schofield on behalf of Crane Co. (Schofield, Rachelle)
December 26, 2018 Filing 49 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric, SE, Other Affiliate American Employers, Other Affiliate Affiliated FM, Other Affiliate Allstate, Other Affiliate London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Lloyds Underwriters for Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(MacDonald, Neil)
December 26, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (MacDonald, Neil)
December 26, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Crane Co. (MacDonald, Neil)
December 21, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 9 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 8 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 7 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 6 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 5 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 4 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 3 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 2b of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 2a of 9 FINAL (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS - Cooper Industries Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Part 1 of 9 (Maisano, Clare)
December 21, 2018 Filing 36 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2018 Filing 35 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Schroll, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Schroll on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Schroll, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC.(Luxton, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Filing 32 QC NOTICE: #17 #18 #19 #20 #21 #22 #23 #24 #25 #26 Notice (Other) filed by CBS Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Documents must be properly labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile document using the event under Notices -> Notice (Other) and properly label the document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 31 QC NOTICE: #15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 VIncent--Viking-Pump-Response-to-Master-RFPD, #2 Hopeman-Fact-Expert-and-MLU-Witness-Designation, #3 Fact Witness List for Koppers Co. Inc, #4 Buranen-Fact Witness List for IMO, #5 NOD-Frank-Schwartz, #6 Letter-regarding-Erroneous-Filing, #7 William-Powell---Expert-and-Fact-Witness-List)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Nash-Engineering-Company-s-Master-Identification-of-All-Witnesses-and-Most-Likely-to, #2 John Crane Inc. Witness-List, #3 GE_Most_Likely_to_Use_Witness_List_-_April_19_Meso, #4 GE_Witness_List_April_19_Meso, #5 Copes-Vulcan_-_Witness_List, #6 Most_Likely_to_Use_Designation-April_19_Meso, #7 Lloyd E. Mitchell-s-Fact-and-Expert-Witness-List, #8 Goulds-Witness-Designations, #9 NOD-Richard-Hare, #10 WGAST-Witness-List)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 NOS-Copes-Vulcan-Case-Specific-Interrogatories-and-Request-for-Production, #2 AL-Automatic-Dismissal-of-CCs, #3 Cooper-Automatic-Dismissal-of-CCs, #4 Disc.-Requests-to-Plaintiff, #5 Interrogs-and-RPDs-to-Pltf, #6 Ans-to-Ingersoll-Rand-1st-Case-Specific-Rogs, #7 Resp-to-Ingersoll-Rand-1st-Case-Specific-RFPD, #8 2nd-Supp-Fact-Witness-List, #9 FINAL Most-Likely-to-Use-Product-ID-Witness-List-, #10 Line-re-Ext-of-Deadlines-x2)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Supp-Fact-Witness-List, #2 Ans-to-Alfa-Laval-Supp-Rogs--Barrett-, #3 Ans-to-Cooper-Supp-Rogs--Barrett-, #4 Ans-to-Foster-Wheeler-Supp-Rogs, #5 Resp-to-Alfa-Laval-1st-RFPD, #6 Resp-to-Cooper-1st-RFPD-, #7 Resp-to-Foster-Wheeler-1st-RFPD, #8 Dismissal-Alfa-Laval, #9 112. Dismissal-Cooper, #10 Copes-Vulcan-Case-Specific-Interrogatories)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 25 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Copes-Vulcan Response to Master RFP, #2 101. Cooper Industries RFP-Response)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC (Luxton, Steven) Modified on 12/21/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Andrew Luxton on behalf of Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC (Luxton, Steven)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Foster Wheeler Resp RPD-Documents, #2 Foster Wheeler Resp RPD-NOS, #3 Alfa Laval Resp RPD--Barrett, #4 Alfa Laval Resp RPD-NOS, #5 GE resp to pltfs RPD, #6 AWC-Notice-of-Automatic-Dismissal, #7 HB Master Answer to cross claims & 3rd party, #8 IR_NOS_-_First_Set_of_Discovery_to_Plaintiff, #9 Ingersoll-Rand_s_First_Set_of_Case_Specific_Interrogatories, #10 Ingersoll-Rand_s_First_Set_of_Case_Specific_RFP_of_Documents)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILINGS OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Imo-Cross-Claim, #2 IMO-Interrogatories, #3 IMO-Response-to-RFAs, #4 IMO-RPD, #5 Siemens-Cross-Claim, #6 Siemens-Interrogatories, #7 Siemens-Notice-to-Pursue-contrib, #8 Siemens-RPDs, #9 Siemens-Answer, #10 Siemens-Response-to-RFAs, #11 Line-Withdrawing-Answer-for-Hopeman, #12 Letter-to-Siemens-Demag-Delaval-Turbomachinery-Inc, #13 Letter-to-Koppers-and-IMO, #14 Ltr-responding-to-IMO-and-Koppers-disc-rqsts, #15 Ltr-responding-to-Siemens-Demag-Delaval-Turbomachinery-Inc-disc-rqsts, #16 Third-Party-Complaint--WGAST--Hopeman, #17 Stip-of-Dismissal-of-John Crane Inc., #18 Alfa Laval RFP to plaintiff, #19 Alfa Laval Rogs-Barrett, #20 Cooper-RFP-Barrett, #21 Cooper-Rogs-Barrett, #22 Foster Wheeler-RFP-Barrett, #23 Foster Wheeler-Rogs-Barrett, #24 Alfa Laval-NOS-Barrett, #25 Cooper-NOS-Barrett, #26 Foster Wheeler-NOS-Barrett, #27 CBS-reassertion-of-crossclaim, #28 IP-reassertion-of-crossclaim, #29 GE_Reassertion_of_Cross_Claim-Barrett, #30 Copes_Reassertion_of_Cross_Claim_-_Barrett, #31 AWC-Stipulation-of-Dismissal, #32 SB Decking_Reassertion_of_Cross_Claim_Barrett, #33 CBS-reassertion-of-crossclaim ag John Crane, #34 IP-reassertion-of-crossclaim-John Crane, #35 MCIC-AMENDED-Cross Claims -HO, #36 MCIC-AMENDED-Crocc Claims -JC, #37 CBS-Responses-RPD, #38 Schneider Electric resp tp Master-RFPs, #39 IP-s-Resp.-to-Master-RFPD, #40 IR-Responses-to-RPD, #41 IR-NOS-for-Responses-to-RPD, #42 Resp of SB Decking to Pltfs RPD, #43 NOS od SB Decking Resp to RPD)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILING OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Trane_Opposition_to_Adding_Barrett_to_April_2019_Trial_Group, #2 Adoption-of-Trane-Opp-to-Add-Barrett-Case, #3 Alfa Laval-3PC-Manville, #4 Alfa Laval Cross Claims, #5 Alfa Laval Answer to Cross Claims, #6 Cooper-3PC-Manville, #7 Cooper-Cross Claims, #8 Cooper Answer to Cross Claims, #9 Foster Wheeler 3PC-Manville, #10 Foster Wheeler Cross Claims, #11 Foster Wheeler Answer to Cross Claims, #12 Lloyd E. Mitchell-Answer-to-Cross Claims, #13 Lloyd E. Mitchell Cross Claims, #14 CBS-Answer, #15 CBS-Answer-to-Crossclaim, #16 CBS-Corporation-s-Omnibus, #17 CBS-Crossclaim, #18 CBS-Letter-to-All-of-Record, #19 CBS-Notice-Adoption-Witnesses, #20 CBS-Notice-Intention-Crossclaim, #21 IP-Answer, #22 IP-Answer-to-Crossclaim, #23 IP-Crossclaim, #24 IP-Notice-of-intention-to-Pursue-Crossclaims, #25 IP-Responses-to-RFA, #26 April-19-Meso-Cross-Claim, #27 General_Electric_Cross_Claim-April_19_Meso, #28 John Crane Inc. Identification-of-Cross-Claims, #29 WGAST-3rd-Party-Complaint, #30 FINAL-Fact-Witness-List, #31 MCIC-EOA, #32 Ltr-to-PL-to-request-depos-of-all-witn.7.19.18, #33 Answer-of-Defendant-Viking-Pump--Inc., #34 Viking-ID-of-Cross-Claims-Buranen-TG, #35 Master-RFPD-to-All-Defendants-Barrett, #36 Koppers-Answer, #37 Koppers-Crossclaims, #38 Koppers-Interrogatories, #39 Koppers-Notice-to-Pursue, #40 Koppers-Response-to-RFAs, #41 43. Koppers-RPDs)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILING OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Answer of Crane Co. to Cross Claims, #2 Cross-Claims-of Crane Co.pdf, #3 IR_Answer, #4 IR_Cross_Claims, #5 Metlife-Answer, #6 MCIC-3PC-Barrett, #7 MCIC-Crocc Claim, #8 Notice-to-Use-Plaintiff, #9 Answer-to-3P-Complaint_MCIC, #10 Answer-to-Complaint-Request-for-Jury-Trial, #11 Nash Engineering Answer to cross & third Party Claims, #12 Nash Engineering Cross Claims ag defs & 3rd p Defs, #13 Nash Engineering Notice of Intention to Pursure Cross Claims, #14 Nash Engineering response to Req for Admission, #15 HIPAA-Authorization-Defense, #16 Verification-Ans-to-Master-Rogs, #17 Goulds-Answer-and-Affirmative-Defenses, #18 Goulds-Master Answer to Cross Claims, #19 ORDER--Buranen_Motion-to-Add-the-Case, #20 Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. Identification-of-Cross-and-3rd-Party-Defs, #21 Dismissal re Hopeman, #22 Dismissal re Lofton, #23 Dismissal re Wayne-Manufacturing, #24 Dismissal re Air-Liquid, #25 Ferro-Engineering, #26 Ingersoll-Rand_Cross_Claim_Reassertion_against_Hopeman_Brothers_, #27 William-Powell-Expert-and-Fact-Witness-List, #28 Stipulation-of-Dismissal-as-to-the-Nash-Engineering-Company)(Maisano, Clare)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF FILING OF STATE COURT MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Path Report, #2 Request-for-Removal-from-Inactive-Civil-Docket, #3 April-2019-Meso-Trial-Group, #4 Motion to Add Barrett to Trial Group, #5 Proposed-Order-Motion-to-Add-Barrett-to-Trial-Group, #6 EOA-for Nash Engineering, #7 Answer General Electric, #8 IMO Answer to Complaint, #9 Copper Industries Answer, #10 MCIC Answer, #11 Answer SB-Decking-Inc.-to-Plaintiffs-Complaint, #12 Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. Answer, #13 WGAST Answer, #14 Answer of Lloyd E. Mitchell to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Lloyd E. Mitchell Inc.'s Cross Claims ag All Defendants & Third party Defs, #16 Lloyd E. Mitchell's Answers to Cross Claims of All Others Defendants, #17 Foster Wheeler-Answer, #18 Alfa-Laval-Answer, #19 Answer-Hampshire, #20 Answer of Schneider Electric (fka Square D Co.) to Pltfs Complaint, #21 Answer-of-Schneider Electric-to-Xclaims, #22 Schneider Electric Notice-of-Intention-to-Pursue-XClaims, #23 Copes-Vulcan-Answer-to-Complaint, #24 The-William-Powell-Company-Answer-to-Complaint, #25 John Crane Inc._Answer_to_Complaint, #26 John Crane Inc._Cross_Claim, #27 Answer-Hopeman, #28 Siemens-Answer, #29 Koppers Answer, #30 Reply-to-Trane-Opp-to-Mot-to-Add-Barrett-to-Trial-Group, #31 AW-Chesterton-Answer-to-Complaint)(Maisano, Clare) Modified on 12/20/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust identifying Other Affiliate New Hampshire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Hartford Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allianz, S.P.A., as successor to Riunione Adriatica di Sicurta, Other Affiliate St. Paul Fire and Marine Company, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Insurance Company, a CNA Company, Other Affiliate The Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Insurance Company (f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Co.) for The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust.(Richmond, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Mason Richmond on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Richmond, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate California Union Insurance Company,, Other Affiliate Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate General Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Other Affiliate ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Stonewall Insurance Company, Other Affiliate International Insurance Company for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Roberts, Theodore)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore F Roberts on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Roberts, Theodore)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation.(Maisano, Clare)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/19/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Deficiency Notice to CBS Corporation. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/26/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by CBS Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Each attachment to the Notice of Removal must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). This filing has been corrected for you but please make note for future filings. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24x18000150., filed by CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint #3 Discovery Material #4 Occupational Health Surveillance Questionnaire)(Maisano, Clare) (Filing Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt #0416-7737829) Modified on 12/19/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lofton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc,
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Matthew R Schroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Rachelle A Schofield
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachiners Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Rachelle A Schofield
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC Inc.
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Lloyd E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Vincent J Palmiotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering Division of On Marine Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corp.
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampshire Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Decking Inc.
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc.
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Michael Thomas Hamilton
Represented By: Rebekah Mears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC
Represented By: Steven Andrew Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Barrett, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Tracie Ward
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Rollins
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Weddle
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Harrison
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Barrett
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barrett
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?