Leonards Shipping Co. v. Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited et al

Plaintiff: Leonards Shipping Co.
Defendant: Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited
Garnishee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A, Glencore Ltd., Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc., Trafigura Trading LLC and HSBC Bank USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv03949
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2.14.19)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense Against Harmony Innovation Shipping Ltd. HK by Leonards Shipping Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonards Shipping Co.. Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #16 NOTICE by Leonards Shipping Co. re #10 Writ of Attachment Issued, #9 Writ of Attachment Issued, 12 Writ of Attachment Issued Dismissal of Garnishees Glencore Ltd., HSBC Bank USA,and Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. Only filed by Leonards Shipping Co. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/9/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Leonards Shipping Co. re #10 Writ of Attachment Issued, #9 Writ of Attachment Issued, #12 Writ of Attachment Issued Dismissal of Garnishees Glencore Ltd., HSBC Bank USA,and Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. Only (Simms, J)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MARGINAL ORDER granting #14 Notice of Dismissal of Garnishee Trafigura Trading LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/8/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Leonards Shipping Co. re #11 Writ of Attachment Issued Dismissal of Garnishee Trafigura Trading LLC Only (Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 Writ of Garnishment Executed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Issued as to Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Issued as to Trafigura Trading LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Issued as to HSBC Bank USA.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Issued as to Glencore Ltd. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Appointment for Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/21/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Writs of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/21/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Leonards Shipping Co. re #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Rule B Writs of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) Text of Proposed Order for Issue of Writs (Simms, J)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Apoint Process Server for Service of Rule B Writs of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment re #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Rule B Writs of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) by Leonards Shipping Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Leonards Shipping Co. (Simms, J)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Rule B Writs of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) by Leonards Shipping Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule B Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment: Glencore, #3 Rule B Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment: HSBC, #4 Rule B Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment: Mercuria, #5 Rule B Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment: Trafigura)(Simms, J)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified With Request for Issue of Writs of Maritime Garnishment and Attachment against Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7744733.), filed by Leonards Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Verified Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Simms, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonards Shipping Co. v. Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Glencore Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Trafigura Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: HSBC Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Innovation Shipping Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonards Shipping Co.
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?