Moran Towing Corporation v. Hansa Heavy Lift Gmbh et al

Plaintiff: Moran Towing Corporation
Defendant: Hansa Heavy Lift Gmbh
Garnishee: Host Agency LLC and T. Parker Host, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2018cv03969
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER approving #16 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/10/2019. (c/d to USMS 1/11/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Moran Towing Corporation (Simms, J)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 Writ of Garnishment Executed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued 21 days as to Moran Towing Corporation.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 MOTION For Appointment For Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/26/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/26/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental to #4 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Moran Towing Corporation Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment for Issuance (Attachments: #1 PMAG - TPH)(Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Moran Towing Corporation Summons (Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION For Appointment For Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Moran Towing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Moran Towing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Moran Towing Corporation (Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Moran Towing Corporation Civil Cover Sheet (Simms, J)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Hansa Heavy Lift Gmbh ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7749557.), filed by Moran Towing Corporation.(Simms, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran Towing Corporation v. Hansa Heavy Lift Gmbh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moran Towing Corporation
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansa Heavy Lift Gmbh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Host Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: T. Parker Host, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?