John v. Radford

Plaintiff: Udo John
Defendant: Linda Radford, Charlestown Community Inc. Senior Campus Living and Charlestown Community, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03975
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Remand Letter sent to the Circuit Court for Baltimore County, MD. (Attachment #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (dass, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #2 Return Receipt Green Card) (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plainitff's #5 Motion to Remand to the Circuit Court for Baltimore County, closing case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/22/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Charlestown Community, Inc..(Baskin, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Udo John (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Hall, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Mark Baskin on behalf of Charlestown Community Inc. (Baskin, Andrew) Modified on 12/28/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Charlestown Community Inc. (English, Donald) Modified on 12/28/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Eugene English, Jr on behalf of Charlestown Community Inc. (English, Donald) Modified on 12/28/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County Maryland, case number 03-C-18-011509 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7750816), filed by Charlestown Community Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons)(English, Donald) Modified on 12/28/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John v. Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlestown Community Inc. Senior Campus Living
Represented By: Donald Eugene English, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Mark Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlestown Community, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Eugene English, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Mark Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Udo John
Represented By: David Andrew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?