Allen v. Verizon Maryland LLC et al
Plaintiff: monique allen and Monique C. Allen
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc. and Verizon Maryland LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03979
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Adam)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC(Simons, Adam)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Monique C. Allen. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/18/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena D Marcuss on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC (Marcuss, Elena)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Verizon Maryland LLC for Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC.(Simons, Adam)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC.(Simons, Adam)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Count II of the Complaint by Monique C. Allen(Dansicker, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monique C. Allen. Verizon Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019.(Dansicker, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monique C. Allen. Verizon Maryland LLC waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019.(Dansicker, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Maryland LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7751747.), filed by Monique C. Allen . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Verizon Maryland LLC Summons, #3 Summons Verizon Communications, Inc. Summons)(Dansicker, Andrew) Modified on 12/28/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Verizon Maryland LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Adam T Simons
Represented By: Elena D Marcuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Maryland LLC
Represented By: Adam T Simons
Represented By: Elena D Marcuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: monique allen
Represented By: Andrew Marc Dansicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique C. Allen
Represented By: Andrew Marc Dansicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?