Johnston et al v. Lamone
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Maryland and Robert S. Johnston, III
Defendant: State Administrator Linda H. Lamone and Linda H. Lamone
Case Number: 1:2018cv03988
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/8/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence re: Joint Motion for Scheduling Order (Grannis, Mark)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2019 re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland before Judge Catherine C. Blake.(Court Reporter: Douglas Zweizig) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #11 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction; Status Report due 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/31/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland.(Grannis, Mark)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Linda H. Lamone Exhibit 10 to Decl. of Andrea W. Trento (not accepted by ECF with filing of Dkt 13) (Trento, Andrea)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Linda H. Lamone. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea W. Trento, #2 Exhibit 1 to Trento Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Trento Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 Trento Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Trento Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Trento Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Trento Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Trento Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Trento Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Trento Declaration, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Mary C. Wagner)(Trento, Andrea)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule and Preservation of Status Quo (Grannis, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 1/23/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Grannis, Mark)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea William Trento on behalf of Linda H. Lamone (Trento, Andrea)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland. Linda H. Lamone served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019.(Grannis, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Certificate of Service filed by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons returned executed" and enter date of service. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland (Grannis, Mark) Modified on 1/17/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davis, Mark)
January 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Linda H. Lamone.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/28/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland or counsel for Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/11/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linda H. Lamone ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7752544.), filed by Robert S. Johnston, III, Libertarian Party of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons L. Lamone)(Grannis, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston et al v. Lamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Maryland
Represented By: Mark A Grannis
Represented By: Mark D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Johnston, III
Represented By: Mark A Grannis
Represented By: Mark D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Administrator Linda H. Lamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda H. Lamone
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?