The Berg Corporation v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Plaintiff: The Berg Corporation
Defendant: C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00043
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1)(Rice, Heather)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff The Berg Corporation's Opposition to Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request For Hearing filed by The Berg Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Berg Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Crushing Corporation of America, Inc., Other Affiliate NickelA, Inc., Other Affiliate BOW, Inc. for The Berg Corporation.(Sorteberg, Kenneth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Statement of Removal (Rice, Heather)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit No. 1)(Rice, Heather)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/7/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Certification(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24C18006342. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637111889), filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CC Complaint, #3 CC Case Information Report, #4 CC Summons)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Berg Corporation v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Berg Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth K Sorteberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Kerry Colleen Raymond
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?