Reverse Mortgage Solutions v. Harding et al

Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Defendant: John H. Harding and Lisa A. Tomlinson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00104
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Letter Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Remand Notification Letter sent to the Circuit Court for Frederick County, Maryland (cm 02/01/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #1 Stamped Acknowledgement, #2 Envelope) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court; remanding this case to the Circuit Court for Frederick County, Maryland; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/1/2019. (cm/cs 02/01/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by John H. Harding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by John H. Harding and Lisa A. Tomlinson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reverse Mortgage Solutions (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Summers, Jessica)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - PER COUNSEL) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reverse Mortgage Solutions (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Summers, Jessica) Modified on 1/18/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/11/2019. (cm 1/11/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by John H. Harding.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Frederick County, Maryland, case number C-10-cv-18000223., filed by Lisa A. Tomlinson and John H. Harding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet (State Court))(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions v. Harding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Represented By: Jessica B Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa A. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?