Wedderburn v. Baltimore County Public Schools et al

Plaintiff: Michelle R. Wedderburn
Defendant: Assata Peterson and Baltimore County Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Baltimore County Public Schools. Baltimore County Public Schools waiver sent on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019.(O Meally, Edmund)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E Konstas on behalf of Baltimore County Public Schools (Konstas, Adam)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J O Meally on behalf of Baltimore County Public Schools (O Meally, Edmund)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER Withdrawing #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #15 Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/1/2019. (c/m 2/1/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2019 re: Plaintiff's #11 Motion and #15 Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Motions withdrawn by Plaintiff - DENIED as MOOT without prejudice, all as stated by and before Judge Paula Xinis. (The Court shall enter a written Order). (FTR - Derro - 4A) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michelle R. Wedderburn. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Defendant)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER scheduling a recorded conference for Friday 1, 2019 at 2:30 p.m.; Directing the Plaintiff to notify the Defendants of the call. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/30/2019. (c/m 1/30/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Public Schools and Assata Peterson.(c/m 1/29/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Clerk to prepare and issue summons and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/28/2019. (c/m 1/29/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michelle R. Wedderburn. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Notice to Defendant of Filing of TRO, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Public Schools, Assata Peterson, filed by Michelle R. Wedderburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Request to issue summons by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 1/25/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint re Revised Exhibit 11, filed by Michelle R. Wedderburn. (MAIN ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR) (Corrected attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #1 Revised Exhibit 11 - Corrected Attachment re Physcian Work Activity Status Report #2 Revised Exhibit 11 -Corrected Attachment re Certificate for Work and Excuse Slip) Modified on 1/24/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 3 Motion Requesting Ex Parte/TRO/Injunctive Relief Against Baltimore County Public Schools et al. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/24/2019. (c/m 1/24/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/24/2019. (c/m 1/24/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Michelle R. Wedderburn. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Public Schools, Assata Peterson (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637112360), filed by Michelle R. Wedderburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedderburn v. Baltimore County Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assata Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Public Schools
Represented By: Adam E Konstas
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Wedderburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?