Marcano v. Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners

Plaintiff: Anthony J. Marcano
Defendant: Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2019cv00229
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Copy of Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, #2 Attachment Copy of Civil Non--Domestic Case Information Report filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, #3 Attachment Copy of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City)(Banton, Tamal)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, filed by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners was filed incorrectly..**Please refile using the correct event> Other Filings> Other Documents> Local Rule. Do not use Local Rule 103.3. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Attachment Copy of Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, #2 Attachment Copy of Civil Non--Domestic Case Information Report filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, #3 Attachment Copy of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City)(Banton, Tamal) Modified on 3/14/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Attachment Copies of Original Pleadings from the Circuit Court for Baltimore City (Case No. 24-C-18-006868))(Banton, Tamal) Modified on 3/13/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Notice (Other), filed by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners was filed incorrectly.**Please refile using the correct event> Other Filings> Other Documents> Local Rule. A certification 103.5 disclosure should be the main document. Each additional attachment should be filed as a separate attachment and labeled. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners Filing Original Copies of Circuit Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Attachment Copies of Original Pleadings from the Circuit Court for Baltimore City (Case No. 24-C-18-006868))(Banton, Tamal) Modified on 3/12/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-E & G attached to his Opposition (ECF Doc. No.: 6) by Anthony J. Marcano (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadri, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Anthony J. Marcano. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Proposed Order, #11 List of Exhibits, #12 Affidavit)(Sadri, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of BCBSC's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - November 2014 Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jerome Jones, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (EEOC Notifications to BCBSC))(Banton, Tamal)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MARGINAL ORDER granting #2 BCBSC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Anthony J. Marcano.(Sadri, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners(Banton, Tamal)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-6868. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637112389) filed by Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Case Information Report, #4 Summons, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcano v. Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners
Represented By: Tamal Ajani Banton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Marcano
Represented By: Paul V Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey J Sadri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?